EP0156567 - Poly-V pulley formed of sheet metal and method and apparatus for making the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.09.1989 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.1997 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 23.04.1997 [1997/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HONDA GIKEN KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 27-8, Jingumae, 6-chome Shibuya-ku, Tokyo 150 / JP | For all designated states SANSHU PURESHU KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-6-8, Kayaba-cho Nihonbashi Chuo-ku Tokyo / JP | [1985/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tanaka, Haruma 2-9-48, Hanezawa Fujimi-shi Saitama / JP | 02 /
Ohashi, Yasuo 2-26-25, Tsuruse Fujimi-shi Saitama / JP | [1985/40] | Representative(s) | Leale, Robin George, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co.,European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1985/40] | Leale, Robin George, et al FRANK B. DEHN & CO. Imperial House 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 85301600.4 | 07.03.1985 | [1985/40] | Priority number, date | JP19840042000 | 07.03.1984 Original published format: JP 4200084 | [1985/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0156567 | Date: | 02.10.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0156567 | Date: | 23.11.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.07.1985 | Classification | IPC: | F16H55/44, B21D53/26 | [1985/40] | CPC: |
B21D51/2615 (EP,US);
B21D53/261 (EP,US);
B21H1/04 (EP,US);
B21H5/02 (EP,US);
F16H55/44 (EP,US);
Y10T29/4946 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1985/40] | Title | German: | Mehrrillige Keilriemenscheibe aus Blech und Verfahren und Vorrichtung zu ihrer Herstellung | [1985/40] | English: | Poly-V pulley formed of sheet metal and method and apparatus for making the same | [1985/40] | French: | Poulie en tôle à gorges multiples en V, procédé et appareil de fabrication | [1985/40] | Examination procedure | 18.03.1986 | Examination requested [1986/21] | 08.05.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.02.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.04.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.05.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.09.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 05.09.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.08.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/45] | Request for further processing for: | 24.02.1988 | Request for further processing filed | 20.02.1988 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 21.03.1988 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.02.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.02.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US1705931 (LEWIS HOWARD S, et al); | [A]FR2470308 (VANTROEYEN ET CIE G [FR]); | [A]FR2507931 (AISIN SEIKI [JP]); | [A]US4131032 (WARLAND GEORGE W, et al); | [AD]US3977264 (SPROUL NOLTE V); | [AD]US4273547 (BYTZEK KLAUS K); | [AD]JPS59215222 (SANSHIYUU PRESS KOGYO KK, et al) | Examination | EP0083684 |