EP0155190 - Non-naturally occurring zymogens and methods and materials for their construction [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.02.1989 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Genentech, Inc. 460 Point San Bruno Boulevard South San Francisco CA 94080 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1985/38] | For all designated states GENENTECH, INC. 460 Point San Bruno Boulevard South San Francisco California 94080 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wetzel, Ronald Burnell 455 Urbano Drive San Francisco California 94127 / US | [1985/38] | Representative(s) | Armitage, Ian Michael, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1985/38] | Armitage, Ian Michael, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 85301828.1 | 15.03.1985 | [1985/38] | Priority number, date | US19840590102 | 16.03.1984 Original published format: US 590102 | US19840649384 | 11.09.1984 Original published format: US 649384 | [1985/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0155190 | Date: | 18.09.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0155190 | Date: | 19.08.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.06.1987 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/00, C12N9/00, C12N9/36 | [1985/38] | CPC: |
C12N9/2462 (EP);
C12N9/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1985/38] | Title | German: | Nicht in der Natur vorkommende Zymogene und Verfahren und Materialien zu deren Herstellung | [1985/38] | English: | Non-naturally occurring zymogens and methods and materials for their construction | [1985/38] | French: | Zymogènes inexistant dans la nature et procédé et matières pour leur préparation | [1985/38] | File destroyed: | 19.07.1995 | Examination procedure | 18.08.1986 | Examination requested [1986/43] | 01.10.1988 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1989/15] | 31.10.1988 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1989/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.02.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.1988 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - SCIENCE, vol. 222, 18th November 1983, pages 782-788; J.E. VILLAFRANCA et al.: "Directed mutagenesis of dihydrofolate reductase" | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 98, no. 3, 17th January 1983, page 147, abstract no. 12350a, Columbus, Ohio, US; P.D. MATTHIAS et al.: "Transient expression of the chicken lysozyme gene after transfer into human cells", & EMBO J. 1982, 1(10), 1207-12 | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 99, no. 1, 4th July 1983, page 126, abstract no. 1133b, Columbus, Ohio, US; J.E. OWEN et al.: "Nucleotide sequence of the lysozyme gene of bacteriophage T4. Analysis of mutations involving repeated sequences", & J. MOL. BIOL. 1983, 165(2), 229-48 | [A] - FROM GENE TO PROTEIN: TRANSLATION INTO BIOTECHNOLOGY, MIAMI WINTER SYMPOSIA, vol. 19, 1982, pages 309-327, edited by F. AHMAD et al., Academic Press, New York, US; H. DE BOER et al.: "Construction of three hybrid promoters and their properties in Escherichia Coli" |