EP0195150 - Torque tube assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.03.1990 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.05.1990 [1990/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GRUMMAN AEROSPACE CORPORATION South Oyster Bay Road Bethpage, NY 11714 / US | [1986/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Arena, Aldo 3 Lonni Lane Smithtown New York 11787 / US | 02 /
Benoit, Robert L. 49 Chatham Drive Oakdale New York 11769 / US | [1986/39] | Representative(s) | Crawford, Fiona Merle, et al Elkington and Fife LLP, Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1986/39] | Crawford, Fiona Merle, et al Elkington and Fife Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 85301970.1 | 21.03.1985 | [1986/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0195150 | Date: | 24.09.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0195150 | Date: | 31.05.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.11.1985 | Classification | IPC: | F16B7/00 | [1986/39] | CPC: |
B21D39/04 (EP);
B21D26/14 (EP);
F16B17/004 (EP);
F16D1/027 (EP);
F16D1/072 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1986/39] | Title | German: | Satz von Hohlwellen zur Übertragung von Drehmomenten | [1986/39] | English: | Torque tube assembly | [1986/39] | French: | Ensemble de tubes pour la transmission de moments de torsion | [1986/39] | Examination procedure | 10.02.1987 | Examination requested [1987/17] | 06.04.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.08.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.09.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.11.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.02.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 16.02.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.03.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.03.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.03.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 31.05.1989 | SE | 31.05.1989 | [1990/12] |
Former [1989/36] | SE | 31.05.1989 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE1107749 ; | [Y]CH129362 ; | [Y]US2596885 ; | [Y]US3642311 ; | [AD]US3837755 |