EP0195151 - Manufacture of diethylaminoethyl dextrans [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.12.1989 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU Updated state(s): BE | published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states POLYDEX PHARMACEUTICALS LIMITED P.O. Box N 7525 Nassau / BS | [1986/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Usher, Thomas C. P.O. Box N7525 Nassau / BS | [1986/39] | Representative(s) | Lambert, Hugh Richmond, et al D. YOUNG & CO., 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | [1986/39] | Application number, filing date | 85301986.7 | 22.03.1985 | [1986/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0195151 | Date: | 24.09.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0195151 | Date: | 25.01.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.01.1986 | Classification | IPC: | C08B37/02 | [1986/39] | CPC: |
C08B37/0021 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/39] | Title | German: | Herstellung von Diethylaminoethyldextranen | [1986/39] | English: | Manufacture of diethylaminoethyl dextrans | [1986/39] | French: | Préparation de diéthylaminoéthyldextranes | [1986/39] | Examination procedure | 12.03.1987 | Examination requested [1987/20] | 04.02.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.05.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.07.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 16.07.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.10.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.03.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 25.01.1989 | BE | 25.01.1989 | NL | 25.01.1989 | SE | 25.01.1989 | LU | 31.03.1989 | [1999/52] |
Former [1990/01] | AT | 25.01.1989 | |
NL | 25.01.1989 | ||
SE | 25.01.1989 | ||
BE | 31.03.1989 | ||
Former [1989/47] | AT | 25.01.1989 | |
SE | 25.01.1989 | ||
BE | 31.03.1989 | ||
Former [1989/39] | SE | 25.01.1989 | |
BE | 31.03.1989 | ||
Former [1989/36] | SE | 25.01.1989 | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]US3851057 (KUZUYA F) | [Y] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 76, no. 16, 17th April 1972, page 102, no. 87386w, Columbus, Ohio, US; M. NEDELCHEVA et al.: "Behavior of lignin and polysaccharides during sulfonation in alkaline media in the presence of sodium borohydride", CHIM. IND. (MILAN) 1971, 53(11), 1018-21 | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 101, no. 26, 24th December 1984, page 77, no. 232094r, Columbus, Ohio, US; LAI, YUAN ZONG et al.: "Effects of base concentration on the degradation of wood components", J. APPL. POLYM. SCI.: APPL. POLYM. SYMP. 1983, 37(Proc. Cellul. Conf. 9th, 1982, Part 2), 943-53 |