EP0160397 - Continuous process for making polymers having pendant azlactone or macromolecular moieties [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.02.1992 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1985/45] | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Engler, David A. c/o Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing Company P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul Minnesota 55133 / US | 02 /
Maistrovich, Anthony R. c/o Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing Company P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul Minnesota 55133 / US | [1985/45] | Representative(s) | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al Ladas & Parry, Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/45] | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al c/o Ladas & Parry Altheimer Eck 2 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 85302165.7 | 28.03.1985 | [1985/45] | Priority number, date | US19840594555 | 29.03.1984 Original published format: US 594555 | [1985/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0160397 | Date: | 06.11.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0160397 | Date: | 09.09.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.07.1987 | Classification | IPC: | C08F220/18, C08F2/02, C09J3/14 | [1987/37] | CPC: |
C08F2/02 (EP,KR);
C08F220/18 (KR);
B29C45/00 (KR);
C08F2/01 (KR);
C08J5/18 (KR);
C09J7/381 (EP,KR)
|
Former IPC [1987/36] | C08F220/18, C09J3/14, C09J3/14 | ||
Former IPC [1985/45] | C08F2/02, C09J3/14 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1985/45] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Polymeren mit Azlacton- oder Makromolekulargruppen | [1985/45] | English: | Continuous process for making polymers having pendant azlactone or macromolecular moieties | [1985/45] | French: | Procédé continu de préparation de polymères avec des groupes azlactones ou macromoléculaires | [1985/45] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 19.02.1988 | Examination requested [1988/16] | 13.06.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.12.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.12.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.09.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/16] | 18.11.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1992/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.02.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.02.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.04.1991 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AP]US4487897 (MATSUOKA NAOKI [JP], et al); | [AD]US4181752 (CLEMENS LAWRENCE M [US], et al); | [A]EP0051169 (BAYER AG [DE]); | [A]EP0017986 (WACKER CHEMIE GMBH [DE]) |