EP0164191 - Stacker-reclaimer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.08.1988 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.08.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.10.1988 [1988/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DRG (UK) LIMITED 1 Redcliffe Street Bristol Avon, BS99 7QY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1985/50] | For all designated states DRG (UK) LIMITED 1 Redcliffe Street Bristol Avon, BS99 7QY / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Evans, David Arthur Yew Tree Cottage Hobwell Lane Ashton Bristol NS9 3QZ / GB | [1985/50] | Representative(s) | Gura, Henry Alan, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | [1985/50] | Application number, filing date | 85302467.7 | 09.04.1985 | [1985/50] | Priority number, date | GB19840009556 | 12.04.1984 Original published format: GB 8409556 | [1985/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0164191 | Date: | 11.12.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0164191 | Date: | 04.11.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.09.1985 | Classification | IPC: | B65G65/20, E02F9/18 | [1985/50] | CPC: |
B65G65/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1985/50] | Title | German: | Absetz- und Aufnahmegerät | [1985/50] | English: | Stacker-reclaimer | [1985/50] | French: | Appareil chargeur-déchargeur | [1985/50] | Examination procedure | 05.02.1986 | Examination requested [1986/16] | 21.08.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 20.11.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.01.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 08.05.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.06.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 24.06.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.08.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.04.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE105168 ; | [A]GB402344 (WILLIAM HUGH WATKINS); | [A]DE1207284 (BETEILIGUNGS & PATENTVERW GMBH); | [A]US3653486 (MCLEAN WILLIAM B, et al); | [A]DE2211078 (BABCOCK & WILCOX AG) |