EP0160438 - A water swellable caulking material for water-leakage prevention [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.12.1989 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.12.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.01.1990 [1990/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states C.I. KASEI CO., LTD 18-1 Kyobashi 1-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo-to / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1985/45] | For all designated states C.I. KASEI CO., LTD 18-1 Kyobashi 1-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo-to / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sasayama, Hiroharu 219-3, Idogi Ageo-shi Saitama-ken / JP | 02 /
Ishihara, Yuji 1-191, Kushibiki-cho Omiya-shi Saitama-ken / JP | [1985/45] | Representative(s) | Allard, Susan Joyce, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1985/45] | Allard, Susan Joyce, et al BOULT, WADE & TENNANT 27 Furnival Street London EC4A 1PQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 85302552.6 | 11.04.1985 | [1985/45] | Priority number, date | JP19840072028 | 11.04.1984 Original published format: JP 7202884 | [1985/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0160438 | Date: | 06.11.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0160438 | Date: | 12.08.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0160438 | Date: | 01.02.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.06.1987 | Classification | IPC: | C04B41/63, C09D5/34 | [1987/30] | CPC: |
C09K3/10 (EP,US);
C09D5/34 (EP,US);
C09K2003/104 (EP,US);
C09K2003/1046 (EP,US);
C09K2200/0615 (EP,US);
C09K2200/0635 (EP,US);
E04B2001/6818 (EP,US);
Y10S428/913 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24942 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31859 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31917 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31928 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31935 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1985/45] | C04B41/63 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL [1985/45] | Title | German: | Mit Wasser quellbares Dichtungsmaterial zur Verhinderung von Wasseraustritt | [1985/45] | English: | A water swellable caulking material for water-leakage prevention | [1985/45] | French: | Matériau de calfeutrage gonflable à l'eau contre les fuites d'eau | [1985/45] | Examination procedure | 26.03.1987 | Examination requested [1987/22] | 01.06.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.08.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.10.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 17.10.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.11.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.03.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP57212269 ; | [A]EP0059062 (KURARAY ISOPRENE CHEM [JP], et al); | [A]EP0055848 (KURARAY CO [JP]); | [A]EP0025286 (LINGNER & FISCHER GMBH [DE]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 7, no. 66 (C-157)[1211], 18th March 1983; & JP - A - 57 212 269 (SUMITOMO K.K.) 27-12-1982, & JP57212269 A 00000000 |