EP0160440 - Apparatus for detecting and obtaining imformation about changes in variables [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 28.04.1992 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RAYCHEM CORPORATION (a Delaware corporation) 300 Constitution Drive Menlo Park, California 94025 / US | [1988/25] |
Former [1985/45] | For all designated states RAYCHEM CORPORATION (a California corporation) 300 Constitution Drive Menlo Park California 94025 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mascia, Michael 41 Inyo Place Redwood City California 94061 / US | 02 /
Reed, James Patrick 1745 Beach Street Apt No. 10 San Fransisco California 94123 / US | [2007/32] |
Former [1985/47] | 01 /
Mascia, Michael 41 Inyo Place Redwood City California 94062 / US | ||
02 /
Reed, James Patrick 1745 Beach Street Apt No. 10 San Fransisco California 94123 / US | |||
Former [1985/45] | 01 /
Mascia, Michael 258 Grant Street Redwood City California 94062 / US | ||
02 /
Reed, James Patrick 1745 Beach Street Apt No. 10 San Fransisco California 94123 / US | Representative(s) | Benson, John Everett, et al Raychem Limited Intellectual Property Law Department Faraday Road Dorcan Swindon, Wiltshire SN3 5HH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1985/45] | Benson, John Everett, et al Raychem Limited Intellectual Property Law Department Faraday Road Dorcan Swindon, Wiltshire SN3 5HH / GB | Application number, filing date | 85302557.5 | 11.04.1985 | [1985/45] | Priority number, date | US19840599048 | 11.04.1984 Original published format: US 599048 | [1985/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0160440 | Date: | 06.11.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.08.1985 | Classification | IPC: | G01R31/08 | [1985/45] | CPC: |
G01R31/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1985/45] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Feststellung und zum Erhalt von Information über Änderungen von Variablen | [1985/45] | English: | Apparatus for detecting and obtaining imformation about changes in variables | [1985/45] | French: | Dispositif pour détecter et recevoir des informations sur des changements de variables | [1985/45] | Examination procedure | 19.04.1985 | Examination requested [1985/45] | 27.11.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.09.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.10.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.06.1989 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 22.08.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.04.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [1992/25] | 17.04.1992 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1992/25] | Appeal following examination | 17.05.1990 | Appeal received No. T0689/90 | 06.08.1990 | Statement of grounds filed | 21.01.1992 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected | 21.01.1992 | Date of oral proceedings | 28.01.1992 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Request for further processing for: | 22.08.1989 | Request for further processing filed | 22.08.1989 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 28.09.1989 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.04.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.04.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.04.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.04.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.04.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE2455007 [ ]; | GB1352124 [ ]; | US1084910 [ ]; | US2581213 [ ]; | US3248646 [ ]; | US3800216 [ ]; | US3991413 [ ]; | GB1481850 [ ]; | DE3225742 [ ] |