EP0160543 - Ventilator which is closable to inhibit spread of smoke and fire [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.08.1988 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DIXON INTERNATIONAL LIMITED Pampisford Cambridge CB2 4HG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1985/45] | For all designated states DIXON INTERNATIONAL LIMITED Pampisford Cambridge CB2 4HG / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tanner, Robert Alfred 63 Brewery Road Pampisford Cambridge / GB | 02 /
Mackie, Peter 7 Har Pare Stud 6 Mile Bottom Nr. Newmarket Suffolk / GB | [1985/45] | Representative(s) | Seaborn, George Stephen, et al Edward Evans Barker Clifford's Inn, Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BZ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1985/45] | Seaborn, George Stephen, et al c/o Edward Evans & Co. Chancery House 53-64 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1SD / GB | Application number, filing date | 85302977.5 | 26.04.1985 | [1985/45] | Priority number, date | GB19840010927 | 27.04.1984 Original published format: GB 8410927 | [1985/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0160543 | Date: | 06.11.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0160543 | Date: | 05.02.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.12.1985 | Classification | IPC: | F24F13/12, A62C3/14 | [1985/45] | CPC: |
A62C2/247 (EP);
F24F13/12 (EP);
F24F11/35 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1985/45] | Title | German: | Schliessbare Ventilationsvorrichtung zum Verhindern der Verbreitung von Rauch und Feuer | [1985/45] | English: | Ventilator which is closable to inhibit spread of smoke and fire | [1985/45] | French: | Aérateur pouvant être fermé pour empêcher la diffusion de fumée et de feu | [1985/45] | File destroyed: | 16.08.1994 | Examination procedure | 10.07.1986 | Examination requested [1986/37] | 17.11.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.11.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.03.1988 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1988/38] | 28.04.1988 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1988/38] | Request for further processing for: | 13.07.1987 | Request for further processing filed | 30.06.1987 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 31.07.1987 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.04.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.05.1988 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE3215076 (SCHLOZ WERNER); | [Y]FR2411948 (DORMA BAUBESCHLAG [DE]); | [Y]US3799046 (GORCHEV D); | [X]US2827140 (KNEBEL HERMAN C); | [X]FR2338091 (SIRULIK WILHELM [FR]); | [A]FR2131958 (SOBINCO FA); | [A]FR1425687 (WESTFAELISCHES METALLWERK); | [A]FR2274004 (CANIVET HERVE [FR]); | [A]US3537380 (SPRADLING JOSEPH W, et al); | [A]DE2935566 (KESSLER & LUCH GMBH) |