EP0186257 - Method of producing abrasion-resistant laminate [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.02.1991 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.04.1991 [1991/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEVAMAR CORPORATION 8339 Telegraph Road Odenton Maryland 21113 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1986/27] | For all designated states NEVAMAR CORPORATION 8339 Telegraph Road Odenton Maryland 21113 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ungar, Israel Sindel 8828 Stonehaven Road Randallstown Maryland 21133 / US | 02 /
Scher, Herbert Irwin 25 Millstone Road Randallstown Maryland 21133 / US | 03 /
O'Neill, Nelson Louis 1769 Regents Park Road West Crofton Maryland 21114 / US | 04 /
O'Dell, Robin Douglas 8645 Cobscook Harbour Pasadena Maryland 21122 / US | [1986/27] | Representative(s) | Fisher, Bernard, et al Raworth, Moss & Cook 36 Sydenham Road Croydon Surrey CR0 2EF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1986/27] | Fisher, Bernard, et al Raworth, Moss & Cook 36 Sydenham Road Croydon Surrey CR0 2EF / GB | Application number, filing date | 85303038.5 | 29.04.1985 | [1986/27] | Priority number, date | US19840686350 | 26.12.1984 Original published format: US 686350 | [1986/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0186257 | Date: | 02.07.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0186257 | Date: | 20.11.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0186257 | Date: | 18.04.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.10.1986 | Classification | IPC: | D21H19/00, B32B29/00 | [1990/16] | CPC: |
B32B29/00 (EP,US);
B32B29/005 (US);
B32B29/06 (US);
D21H27/28 (EP,US);
B32B2260/028 (US);
B32B2260/046 (US);
B32B2307/554 (US);
B32B2317/122 (US);
B32B2451/00 (US);
|
Former IPC [1986/27] | D21H5/00, B32B29/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1986/27] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines abriebbeständigen Laminats | [1986/27] | English: | Method of producing abrasion-resistant laminate | [1986/27] | French: | Méthode de fabrication d'un laminé résistant à l'abrasion | [1986/27] | Examination procedure | 21.03.1987 | Examination requested [1987/21] | 23.02.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.08.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.10.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.02.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.06.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 25.09.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 12.10.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.12.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 27.12.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.01.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.04.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.03.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2366564 (SHAW VAN L); | [A]GB857491 (FORMICA INT); | [A]GB986721 (JOHN WILLETT RIDDING); | [X]GB1013662 (VIKTOR BAUSCH); | [AD]US3373071 (FUCRST PETER E); | [A]US3525664 (HALE EDWARD CHALONER, et al); | [A]GB1221976 (MONSANTO CO [US]); | [A]US4123579 (MCCASKEY JR HAROLD O); | [AD]US4255480 (SCHER HERBERT I, et al); | [AD]US4322468 (RAGHAVA RAM S) |