EP0161868 - Fluorometric assay of IgG4 [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.09.1993 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.09.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.10.1993 [1993/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BioWhittaker, Inc. 8830 Biggs Ford Road Walkersville, Maryland 21793-0127 / US | [1992/23] |
Former [1992/22] | For all designated states WHITTAKER BIOPROCUCTS, INC. 8830 Boggs Ford Road Walkerville, Maryland 21793-0127 / US | ||
Former [1986/06] | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | ||
Former [1985/47] | For all designated states AXONICS, INC. 1500 Salado Drive, Ste 202 Mountain View California 94043 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Halpern, George M. 9 Hillbrook Drive Portola Valley, CA 94025 / US | 02 /
Scott, John, R. 521 Del Medio, no. 103 Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | 03 /
Yuh-Geng, Tsay 1933 Cape Horn Drive San Jose, CA 95133 / US | 04 /
Sun, Jane V. 13005 La Cresta Drive Los Altos Hills, CA 94022 / US | [1992/45] |
Former [1985/47] | 01 /
Halpern, George M. 9 Hillbrook Drive Portola Valley California 94025 / US | ||
02 /
Scott, John, R. 521 Del Medio No. 103 Mountain View California 94043 / US | |||
03 /
Yuh-Geng, Tsay 1933 Cape Horn Drive San Jose California 95133 / US | |||
04 /
Sun, Jane V. 13005 La Cresta Drive Los Altos Hills California 94022 / US | Representative(s) | Armitage, Ian Michael, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/45] | Armitage, Ian Michael, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | ||
Former [1992/22] | Bannerman, David Gardner Withers & Rogers 4 Dyer's Buildings Holborn London, EC1N 2JT / GB | ||
Former [1985/47] | Armitage, Ian Michael MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 85303100.3 | 01.05.1985 | [1985/47] | Priority number, date | US19840609267 | 11.05.1984 Original published format: US 609267 | [1985/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0161868 | Date: | 21.11.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0161868 | Date: | 07.01.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0161868 | Date: | 04.11.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.11.1987 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/53, G01N33/543, G01N33/545, G01N33/577 | [1985/47] | CPC: |
G01N33/6854 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE [1992/45] |
Former [1985/47] | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | Fluoreszenztest für IgG4 | [1985/47] | English: | Fluorometric assay of IgG4 | [1985/47] | French: | Dosage fluorimétrique d'IgG4 | [1985/47] | Examination procedure | 09.04.1988 | Examination requested [1988/23] | 27.12.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M10) | 01.03.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.08.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 13.09.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.12.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.05.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.07.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 31.07.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.08.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/43] | Request for further processing for: | 22.02.1991 | Request for further processing filed | 22.02.1991 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 21.05.1991 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.04.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.04.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.04.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.04.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0088974 ; | [Y]US4444879 ; | [X]US4410634 | [Y] - ANNALS OF ALLERGY, vol. 46, March 1981, pages 132-136, US; N.-K.V. CHEUNG et al.: "A microtiter solid phase radioimmunoassay for total serum IgE" | [Y] - ANALYTICAL BIOCHEMISTRY, vol. 117, 1981, pages 53-60, Academic Press, Inc., New York, US; P.K. GOLDSMITH: "A highly sensitive enzyme-linked immunosorbent assay for human immunoglobulin E: comparison of microtiter plate and disk methodologies" | [Y] - HYBRIDOMA, vol. 1, no. 3, March 1982, pages 257-273, Mary Ann Liebert, Inc., Chicago, US; T.A. SPRINGER et al.: "Monoclonal antibodies specific for rat IgG1, IgG2a, and IgG2b subclasses, and kappa chain monotypic and allotypic determinants: reagents for use with rat monoclonal antibodies" | Examination | - ENZYME-IMMUNOASSAY, E.T.Maggio (ed.), CRC Press, Boca Raton, FL (US), 1980; pp. 181-193< | - KLIN. WOCHENSCHRIFT, vol. 58, 1980; R.URBANEK et al., pp. 1257-1260< | - KLIN. WOCHENSCHRIFT, vol. 57, 1979; FORSTER et al., pp. 421-422< |