EP0161899 - Dentifrice compositions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.07.1992 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 06.08.2008 [2008/32] | Applicant(s) | For:GB
Unilever PLC Unilever House Blackfriars London Greater London EC4P 4BQ / GB | For:AT
BE
CH
DE
FR
IT
LI
NL
SE
Unilever N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/32] | For:GB
Unilever PLC Unilever House Blackfriars London EC4P 4BQ / GB | ||
For:AT
BE
CH
DE
FR
IT
LI
NL
SE
Unilever N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | |||
Former [1985/47] | For:GB
UNILEVER PLC Unilever House Blackfriars P.O. Box 68 London EC4P 4BQ / GB | ||
For:AT
BE
CH
DE
FR
IT
LI
NL
SE
UNILEVER N.V. Weena 455 NL-3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Saxton, Charles Allan 8 Thornton Crescent Gayton Wirral Merseyside / GB | [1985/47] | Representative(s) | van Gent, Jan Paulus, et al Unilever N.V. Patent Division Postbus 137 NL-3130 AC Vlaardingen / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1989/30] | van Gent, Jan Paulus, et al Unilever N.V. Patent Division Postbus 137 NL-3130 AC Vlaardingen / NL | ||
Former [1985/47] | Doucy, Robert Henry Unilever PLC Patents Division P.O. Box 68 Unilever House London EC4P 4BQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 85303217.5 | 07.05.1985 | [1985/47] | Priority number, date | GB19840011841 | 09.05.1984 Original published format: GB 8411841 | [1985/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0161899 | Date: | 21.11.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0161899 | Date: | 14.09.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0161899 | Date: | 28.08.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.07.1988 | Classification | IPC: | A61K7/16, A61K7/24 | [1985/47] | CPC: |
A61K8/347 (EP);
A61K8/365 (EP);
A61Q11/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1985/47] | Title | German: | Zahnpflegemittel | [1985/47] | English: | Dentifrice compositions | [1985/47] | French: | Compositions dentifrices | [1985/47] | Examination procedure | 21.02.1989 | Examination requested [1989/17] | 21.11.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 25.07.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.10.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.11.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.12.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 12.12.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.05.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.05.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.05.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.05.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.05.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4022880 (VINSON LEONARD J, et al) |