EP0164218 - Syphon assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1985/50] | Syphon assembly, package, head, method, filling apparatus and filling process | ||
[1989/51] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.10.1990 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.12.1990 [1990/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hagan, Richard J. 444 Laurel Street San Carlos California 94070 / US | For all designated states Lempert, Dennis A. 11642 Dawson Drive Los Altos Hills California 94022 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1985/50] | For all designated states Hagan, Richard J. 444 Laurel Street San Carlos California 94070 / US | ||
For all designated states Lempert, Dennis A. 11642 Dawson Drive Los Altos Hills California 94022 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1985/50] | Representative(s) | Williams, Trevor John, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5EU / GB | [1985/50] | Application number, filing date | 85303227.4 | 07.05.1985 | [1985/50] | Priority number, date | US19840609280 | 10.05.1984 Original published format: US 609280 | US19840635450 | 31.07.1984 Original published format: US 635450 | US19840685912 | 27.12.1984 Original published format: US 685912 | US19840687296 | 28.12.1984 Original published format: US 687296 | US19850704763 | 20.02.1985 Original published format: US 704763 | [1985/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0164218 | Date: | 11.12.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0164218 | Date: | 19.03.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0164218 | Date: | 20.12.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.01.1986 | Classification | IPC: | B67D1/04, B65D83/14 | [1985/50] | CPC: |
B67C3/24 (EP);
B67C3/065 (EP);
B67D1/0456 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1985/50] | Title | German: | Siphonanlage | [1989/51] | English: | Syphon assembly | [1989/51] | French: | Appareil à siphon | [1989/51] |
Former [1985/50] | Siphonanlage, Verpackung, Köpfe, Verfahren, Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum Abfüllen | ||
Former [1985/50] | Syphon assembly, package, head, method, filling apparatus and filling process | ||
Former [1985/50] | Appareil à siphon, emballage tête, procédé, dispositif et procédé de remplissage | Miscellaneous | EPB 1989/51: Divisional application 88107317 filed on 06.05.88 | Examination procedure | 09.09.1986 | Examination requested [1986/45] | 02.04.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 15.01.1988 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 07.03.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.05.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.10.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.12.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.05.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.07.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 26.07.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP88107317.5 / EP0291788 | Opposition(s) | 21.09.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/49] | Request for further processing for: | 07.03.1988 | Request for further processing filed | 07.03.1988 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 30.03.1988 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.05.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.06.1987 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   27.08.1987 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR351139 (JOHN GEORGE HENRICH [GB]); | [Y]US2066121 (MORRIS CLARENCE P); | [Y]US2185290 (SANCHEZ BRAVO HILARIO, et al); | [Y]FR1036948 ; | [X]FR2382946 (OREAL [FR]); | [Y]FR2462629 (LAMBERT LOUIS [AU]); | [X]EP0097094 (VALVE PRECISION SARL [FR]) |