EP0161913 - Method and apparatus for subscription control for television programming [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.01.1992 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.01.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.03.1992 [1992/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COMMUNICATIONS SATELLITE CORPORATION 950 L'Enfant Plaza, S.W. Washington, D.C. 20024 / US | [1985/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lee, Lin Nan 7605 Fontaine Street Potomac Maryland 20854 / US | 02 /
Becker, Neal David 10 Sunny Way Thurmont Maryland 21788 / US | [1985/47] | Representative(s) | Rackham, Stephen Neil, et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/10] | Rackham, Stephen Neil, et al GILL JENNINGS & EVERY, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | ||
Former [1985/47] | Jennings, Guy Kenneth GILL JENNINGS & EVERY, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 85303289.4 | 09.05.1985 | [1985/47] | Priority number, date | US19840608671 | 09.05.1984 Original published format: US 608671 | [1985/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0161913 | Date: | 21.11.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0161913 | Date: | 05.08.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0161913 | Date: | 27.03.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/13] | Type: | B1 RE Reissue of patent specification | No.: | EP0161913 | Date: | 19.08.1991 | [1991/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.06.1987 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/16 | [1985/47] | CPC: |
H04H20/28 (EP);
H04N7/0888 (EP);
H04N7/162 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, SE [1985/47] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Gerät zur Abonnementsteuerung zur Fernsehprogrammierung | [1985/47] | English: | Method and apparatus for subscription control for television programming | [1985/47] | French: | Procédé et appareil pour la commande d'abonnement pour la programmation de télévision | [1985/47] | Examination procedure | 21.01.1988 | Examination requested [1988/12] | 29.09.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.01.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.05.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.09.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.12.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 19.12.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.12.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.05.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.05.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.05.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.05.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AP]US4460922 ; | [A]US4325078 ; | [A]US4292650 |