Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] |
07.05.1987 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.06.1987 [1987/26] |
17.06.1986 | Change - representative | published on 06.08.1986 [1986/32] |
13.06.1986 | Change - applicant | published on 30.07.1986 [1986/31] |
12.02.1986 | Publication of search report | published on 02.04.1986 [1986/14] |
20.09.1985 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 21.11.1985 [1985/47] |