Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPS6121409 | 30.01.1986 | A | Priority number | Date | US60948484 | 11.05.1984 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU572992B | Global Dossier | 19.05.1988 | B2 | AU4222485 | 14.11.1985 | A | Priority number | Date | US72058985 | 08.04.1985 | US60948484 | 11.05.1984 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0161916 | Global Dossier | 02.04.1986 | A3 | EP0161916 | 21.11.1985 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US72058985 | 08.04.1985 | US60948484 | 11.05.1984 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA1251961 | 04.04.1989 | A | Priority number | Date | US72058985 | 08.04.1985 | US60948484 | 11.05.1984 |