EP0165720 - Shelf-stable, non-aqueous spreadable fillings [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.01.1987 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SCM CORPORATION 925 Euclid Avenue Cleveland, OH 44115 / US | [1985/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Player, Kenneth W. 9780 Douglas Lanes Olmsted Falls Ohio / US | 02 /
Wilson, Lonny L. 321 Parkland Oval Brunswick Ohio / US | [1985/52] | Representative(s) | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al Ladas & Parry, Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/52] | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al c/o Ladas & Parry Altheimer Eck 2 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 85303648.1 | 23.05.1985 | [1985/52] | Priority number, date | US19840612976 | 23.05.1984 Original published format: US 612976 | [1985/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0165720 | Date: | 27.12.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.10.1985 | Classification | IPC: | A23D5/00, A23D5/02, A23C19/093, A23L1/30 | [1985/52] | CPC: |
A23D9/013 (EP);
A23C19/093 (EP);
A23J3/00 (EP);
A23L33/115 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1985/52] | Title | German: | Schmierbare haltbare nichtwässrige Füllung | [1985/52] | English: | Shelf-stable, non-aqueous spreadable fillings | [1985/52] | French: | Matière de remplissage à étaler non-aqueuse apte à la conservation | [1985/52] | File destroyed: | 23.06.1993 | Examination procedure | 28.08.1986 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1987/10] | 23.09.1986 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1987/10] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2310704 ; | [X]GB1516374 ; | [X]GB1458568 ; | [XP]EP0121253 |