Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] |
12.02.1986 | Withdrawal of application | published on 02.04.1986 [1986/14] |
09.11.1985 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 08.01.1986 [1986/02] |
09.11.1985 | Request for examination filed | published on 08.01.1986 [1986/02] |