EP0164266 - Chair [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.04.1988 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HAUSERMAN INC. 5711 Grant Avenue Cleveland Ohio 44105 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1985/50] | For all designated states HAUSERMAN INC. 5711 Grant Avenue Cleveland Ohio 44105 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Diffrient, Niels 879 North Salem Road Ridgefield Connecticut 06877 / US | [1985/50] | Representative(s) | Topps, Ronald, et al D. YOUNG & CO 10 Staple Inn London WC1V 7RD / GB | [1985/50] | Application number, filing date | 85303993.1 | 05.06.1985 | [1985/50] | Priority number, date | US19840618518 | 08.06.1984 Original published format: US 618518 | [1985/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0164266 | Date: | 11.12.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0164266 | Date: | 01.04.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.02.1987 | Classification | IPC: | A47C3/026 | [1985/50] | CPC: |
A47C1/023 (EP);
A47C3/026 (EP,KR,US);
A47C7/443 (EP,KR,US);
A47C1/03255 (KR);
A47C3/0255 (KR);
A47C7/004 (KR);
A47C7/546 (KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1985/50] | Title | German: | Stuhl | [1985/50] | English: | Chair | [1985/50] | French: | Siège | [1985/50] | File destroyed: | 16.08.1994 | Examination procedure | 02.10.1987 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1988/22] | 06.01.1988 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1988/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.06.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 01.10.1987 | M02   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2830650 (ANTON LORENZ); | [A]FR2390131 (CENTER DESIGN RES & DEV [NL]) |