EP0164274 - Chrominance signal processing system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.11.1991 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1985/50] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Ohaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu, 571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Matsumoto, Tokikazu 3-13-8, Tanabe Higashisumiyoshi-ku Osaka-shi osaka-fu 546 / JP | 02 /
Nakagawa, Yukio Syonan-ryo 1-23, Kikusuidori Moriguchi-shi Osaka-fu 570 / JP | 03 /
Uchiyama, Shinich 6-chome 2-204, Myokenzaka Katano-shi Osaka-fu 576 / JP | [1985/50] | Representative(s) | Crawford, Andrew Birkby, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1985/50] | Crawford, Andrew Birkby, et al A.A. THORNTON & CO. Northumberland House 303-306 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 85304060.8 | 07.06.1985 | [1985/50] | Priority number, date | JP19840118513 | 08.06.1984 Original published format: JP 11851384 | JP19840135633 | 29.06.1984 Original published format: JP 13563384 | [1985/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0164274 | Date: | 11.12.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0164274 | Date: | 28.01.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0164274 | Date: | 30.01.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.12.1986 | Classification | IPC: | H04N9/68 | [1985/50] | CPC: |
H04N9/793 (EP,US);
H04N9/68 (EP,KR,US);
H04N9/7904 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1985/50] | Title | German: | Chrominanzsignal-Verarbeitungssystem | [1985/50] | English: | Chrominance signal processing system | [1985/50] | French: | Système de traitement d'un signal de chrominance | [1985/50] | Examination procedure | 24.07.1987 | Examination requested [1987/39] | 24.07.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.11.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.03.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.08.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.10.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 23.10.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.10.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.06.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.06.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.06.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 30.01.1991 | [2006/14] |
Former [1992/02] | FR | 21.06.1991 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2644465 (SONY CORP); | [A]US4400742 (YAMAMITSU CHOJURO [JP], et al); | [A]US4434439 (STECKLER STEVEN A [US], et al); | [A]GB2128442 (RCA CORP) |