EP0168190 - Mattress and supporting structure therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.06.1989 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.1989 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.08.1989 [1989/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mizelle, Ned W. 230C North Point Avenue High Point North Carolina 27260 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1986/03] | For all designated states Mizelle, Ned W. 230C North Point Avenue High Point North Carolina 27260 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1986/03] | Representative(s) | Bayliss, Geoffrey Cyril, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1986/03] | Bayliss, Geoffrey Cyril, et al BOULT, WADE & TENNANT 27 Furnival Street London EC4A 1PQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 85304458.4 | 21.06.1985 | [1986/03] | Priority number, date | US19840623263 | 21.06.1984 Original published format: US 623263 | [1986/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0168190 | Date: | 15.01.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.10.1985 | Classification | IPC: | A47C27/00, A47C27/14 | [1986/03] | CPC: |
A47C27/146 (EP,US);
A47C27/148 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, NL [1986/03] | Title | German: | Matratze und Matratzenauflage | [1986/03] | English: | Mattress and supporting structure therefor | [1986/03] | French: | Matelas et structure de support | [1986/03] | File destroyed: | 21.07.1995 | Examination procedure | 15.07.1986 | Examination requested [1986/37] | 14.09.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.01.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.06.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.10.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.02.1989 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1989/31] | 06.03.1989 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1989/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.06.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR1251145 (BURK TEXTILFABRIK K G); | [YD]US4236260 (MIZELLE NED W); | [Y]FR1170970 ; | [A]US3058126 (FLEMING EARL N, et al) |