EP0178751 - Silicone elastomers with good adhesion [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.10.1989 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.11.1989 [1989/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dow Corning Limited Inveresk House 1 Aldywch London WC2R 0HF / GB | For all designated states DOW CORNING S.A. Parc Industriel B-6198 Seneffe / BE | [1986/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Joseph, Edouard Pioenenstraat 39 B-1640 Rode-St. Genese / BE | 02 /
Trego, Brian Robert 17 Robert Schuitenlaan B-1981 Vossem / BE | [1986/17] | Representative(s) | Walbeoff, William John Dow Corning Limited Cardiff Road Barry South Glamorgan CF6 7YL Wales / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1986/17] | Walbeoff, William John Dow Corning Limited Cardiff Road Barry South Glamorgan CF6 7YL Wales / GB | Application number, filing date | 85304502.9 | 25.06.1985 | [1986/17] | Priority number, date | GB19840019106 | 26.07.1984 Original published format: GB 8419106 | GB19840028669 | 13.11.1984 Original published format: GB 8428669 | [1986/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0178751 | Date: | 23.04.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0178751 | Date: | 07.12.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.01.1986 | Classification | IPC: | C08L83/04 | [1986/17] | CPC: |
C08K5/54 (EP,US);
C08G77/16 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08K5/54, C08L83/04 (EP,US);
C08L83/04, C08L2666/44 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1986/17] | Title | German: | Silikonelastomere mit guter Haftung | [1986/17] | English: | Silicone elastomers with good adhesion | [1986/17] | French: | Elastomères de silicones avec un bon pouvoir adhésif | [1986/17] | Examination procedure | 14.05.1986 | Examination requested [1986/30] | 07.05.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.07.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.12.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 29.04.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 07.06.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.06.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 16.06.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.09.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.04.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP7990348 ; | [Y]JP7980358 ; | [X]GB2067212 (TORAY SILICONE CO); | [Y]US4252933 (SUMIDA HEIJI); | [A]US4412035 (KURITA AKITSUGU [JP]) | [Y] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 92, no. 2, January 1980, page 56, no. 7696q, Columbus, Ohio, US; & JP - A - 79 90 348 (TOSHIBA SILICONE CO., LTD.) 18-07-1979, & JP7990348 A 00000000 | [Y] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 91, no. 26, December 1979, page 34, no. 212295d, Columbus, Ohio, US; & JP - A - 79 80 358 (SHIN-ETSU CHEMICAL INDUSTRY CO., LTD.) 27-06-1979, & JP7980358 A 00000000 |