EP0167370 - Foamed, extruded tobacco-containing smoking articles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.02.1991 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.04.1991 [1991/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Philip Morris Products Inc. 3601 Commerce Road Richmond Virginia 23234 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1988/37] | For all designated states Philip Morris Products Inc. 3601 Commerce Road Richmond Virginia 23234 / US | ||
Former [1986/02] | For all designated states PHILIP MORRIS INCORPORATED 120 Park Avenue New York, New York 10017 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Burnett, George Henry 802 Baldwin Road Richmond Virginia 23229 / US | 02 /
Keritsis, Gus Demitrios 104 Carbe Court Richmond Virginia 23236 / US | 03 /
Wayte, Alline Roger 4407 Archer Avenue Richmond Virginia 23225 / US | 04 /
Nepomuceno, Jose G. 4108 Forest Hill Avenue Richmond Virginia 32225 / US | 05 /
Gergely, Alex Sandor 1655 Mayway Drive Powhatan Virginia 23139 / US | [1986/02] | Representative(s) | Smith, Philip Antony, et al REDDIE & GROSE 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | [1986/02] | Application number, filing date | 85304645.6 | 28.06.1985 | [1986/02] | Priority number, date | US19840627407 | 03.07.1984 Original published format: US 627407 | [1986/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0167370 | Date: | 08.01.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0167370 | Date: | 05.03.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0167370 | Date: | 25.04.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.01.1986 | Classification | IPC: | A24B3/14, A24B15/28 | [1986/02] | CPC: |
A24B3/14 (EP,US);
A24B15/14 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1986/02] | Title | German: | Schäumenden extrudierten Tabak enthaltende Artikel | [1986/02] | English: | Foamed, extruded tobacco-containing smoking articles | [1986/02] | French: | Articles à fumer contenant du tabac mousseux extrudé | [1986/02] | Examination procedure | 15.07.1986 | Examination requested [1986/37] | 02.12.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.05.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.09.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.03.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 08.10.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 27.10.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.01.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 05.01.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.01.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.06.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.06.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB1055445 (AMERICAN MACH & FOUNDRY); | [Y]CA951209 (HERCULES INC); | [X]EP0056308 (PHILIP MORRIS INC [US]); | [A]US4333484 (KERITSIS GUS D); | [A]US4233993 (MIANO RALPH R, et al); | [A]US2433877 (WELLS FRANKLIN H, et al) | Examination | EP0113595 |