Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Event history: EP0167400


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
13.04.1991 No opposition filed within time limit published on  05.06.1991 [1991/23]
28.04.1990 (Expected) grant published on  13.06.1990 [1990/24]
05.02.1988 First examination report
22.10.1986 Request for examination filed published on  10.12.1986 [1986/50]
20.02.1986 Publication of search report published on  09.04.1986 [1986/15]
09.11.1985 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  08.01.1986 [1986/02]