blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0167400

EP0167400 - Separator plate for lead-acid battery [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.04.1991
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip13.04.1991No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 05.06.1991 [1991/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Wozniak, Eugene
12960 South Ashland Avenue Blue Island
Illinois 60406 / US
[N/P]
Former [1986/02]For all designated states
Wozniak, Eugene
12960 South Ashland Avenue
Blue Island Illinois 60406 / US
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[1986/02]
Representative(s)Crawford, Andrew Birkby, et al
A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn
London WC1V 7LE / GB
[N/P]
Former [1986/02]Crawford, Andrew Birkby, et al
A.A. THORNTON & CO. Northumberland House 303-306 High Holborn
London WC1V 7LE / GB
Application number, filing date85304778.504.07.1985
[1986/02]
Priority number, dateUS1984062803005.07.1984         Original published format: US 628030
[1986/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0167400
Date:08.01.1986
Language:EN
[1986/02]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0167400
Date:09.04.1986
Language:EN
[1986/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0167400
Date:13.06.1990
Language:EN
[1990/24]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.02.1986
ClassificationIPC:H01M10/12, H01M2/18
[1986/02]
CPC:
H01M10/14 (EP,US); H01M10/12 (EP,US); H01M50/463 (EP,US);
Y02E60/10 (EP,US); Y02P70/50 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LU [1986/02]
TitleGerman:Separatorplatte für eine Bleisäurebatterie[1986/02]
English:Separator plate for lead-acid battery[1986/02]
French:Plaque séparatrice pour batterie acide au plomb[1986/02]
Examination procedure10.10.1986Examination requested  [1986/50]
05.02.1988Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.07.1988Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
17.08.1988Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.01.1989Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
03.04.1989Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.07.1989Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
01.12.1989Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.02.1990Fee for grant paid
19.02.1990Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)14.03.1991No opposition filed within time limit [1991/23]
Request for further processing for:17.08.1988Request for further processing filed
15.08.1988Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
08.09.1988Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.07.1987Renewal fee patent year 03
13.07.1988Renewal fee patent year 04
10.07.1989Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
09.10.1986M02   Fee paid on   12.11.1986
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]DE620080  (ACCUMULATEURS ELECTR ANCIENS E);
 [A]US2084964  (SMITH EDWARD W);
 [A]FR959980  ;
 [A]US2616938  (ERIK BRANDT GUSTAF);
 [A]DE2439186  (GRACE GMBH);
 [A]FR2468212  (CITROEN SA [FR])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.