EP0208028 - Lifting gear and testing it [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.10.1988 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.07.2009 | Change - representative | published on 02.09.2009 [2009/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PMB SYSTEMS ENGINEERING LIMITED Bechtel House 245 Hammersmith Road London W6 8DP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/03] | For all designated states PMB SYSTEMS ENGINEERING LIMITED Bechtel House 245 Hammersmith Road London W6 8DP / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fern, Derek Thomas 169 Cassiobury Drive Watford Hertfordshire, WD1 3AL / GB | [1987/03] | Representative(s) | Harrison, David Christopher, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/36] | Harrison, David Christopher, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | ||
Former [1987/03] | Harrison, David Christopher, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 85304847.8 | 08.07.1985 | [1987/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0208028 | Date: | 14.01.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.05.1986 | Classification | IPC: | B66C1/12 | [1987/03] | CPC: |
B66C1/66 (EP,US);
B66C1/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT, NL [1987/03] | Title | German: | Hebevorrichtung und Prüfeinrichtung | [1987/03] | English: | Lifting gear and testing it | [1987/03] | French: | Appareil de levage et dispositif d'essai | [1987/03] | File destroyed: | 16.08.1994 | Examination procedure | 20.05.1987 | Examination requested [1987/29] | 04.02.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.06.1988 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1988/50] | 14.07.1988 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1988/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.07.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.08.1988 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3128117 (ANDREW ABOLINS); | [A]US3137051 (BETHEA JR MALCOLM); | [A]GB1219568 (GORE GEORGE LESLIE); | [X]GB2040872 (OCEANIC CONTRACTORS) |