EP0169033 - Inhibitors of slow reacting substance of anaphylaxis [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.12.1992 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.12.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.02.1993 [1993/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schering Corporation 2000 Galloping Hill Road Kenilworth, NJ 07033 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1986/04] | For all designated states SCHERING CORPORATION 2000 Galloping Hill Road Kenilworth New Jersey 07033 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Saksena, Anil Kumar 53 Beverly Road Upper Montclair, NJ 07043 / US | 02 /
Wong, Jesse Kwok-Keung 547 Andress Terrace Union, NJ 07083 / US | 03 /
Mangiaracina, Pietro 4 Montclair Avenue Monsey, NY 10952 / US | [1986/04] | Representative(s) | Ritter, Stephen David, et al Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1986/04] | Ritter, Stephen David, et al Mathys & Squire 100 Grays Inn Road London WC1X 8AL / GB | Application number, filing date | 85304967.4 | 11.07.1985 | [1986/04] | Priority number, date | US19840632143 | 18.07.1984 Original published format: US 632143 | [1986/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0169033 | Date: | 22.01.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0169033 | Date: | 16.09.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0169033 | Date: | 12.02.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.07.1987 | Classification | IPC: | C07C59/60, C07C327/18, C07C327/36, C07C69/734, C07C43/178, C07C229/30, C07D309/00 | [1992/07] | CPC: |
C07C59/60 (EP);
A61K31/19 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
C07C323/00 (EP);
C07C33/042 (EP);
| C-Set: |
C07C45/515, C07C47/222 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1986/04] | C07C59/60, C07C153/023, C07C69/734, C07C43/178, C07C101/28, C07D309/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1986/04] | Title | German: | Inhibitoren der langsam reagierenden anaphylaktischen Substanz | [1986/04] | English: | Inhibitors of slow reacting substance of anaphylaxis | [1986/04] | French: | Inhibiteurs d'une substance anaphylactique à action retardée | [1986/04] | Examination procedure | 03.11.1987 | Examination requested [1988/02] | 30.06.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.01.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.01.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.03.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.07.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 04.07.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.11.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.06.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.06.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.06.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.06.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP53030653 ; | [A]US2602816 (GREGORY JAMES T, et al); | [X]US3217004 (INGENUIN HECHENBLEIKNER, et al); | [E]EP0153009 (SMITHKLINE BECKMAN CORP [US]) | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 89, no. 16, 16th october 1978, page 36, abstract no. 130417q, Columbus, Ohio, US; & JP-A-53 030 653 (SANKYO ORGANIC CHEMICALS CO., LTD) 23-03-1978, & JP53030653 A 00000000 | [Y] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 73, no. 9, 31st August 1970, page 262, abstract no. 44807e, Columbus, Ohio, US; A. CASTEK et al.: "Synthesis of long-chain alkynes", & BULL. SCI., CONS. ACAD. SCI. ARTS RSF YOUGOSLAVIE, SECT. A 1970, 15(5-6), 157 |