EP0171227 - Use of propiophenone compound [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.08.1989 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE WELLCOME FOUNDATION LIMITED Unicorn House 160 Euston Road P.O. Box 129 London NW1 2BP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1986/07] | For all designated states THE WELLCOME FOUNDATION LIMITED Unicorn House 160 Euston Road London NW1 2BP / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stern, Warren Charles 8904 Willow Wood Court Raleigh North Carolina 27612 / US | [1986/07] | Application number, filing date | 85305253.8 | 24.07.1985 | [1986/07] | Priority number, date | US19840634451 | 25.07.1984 Original published format: US 634451 | US19850715078 | 22.03.1985 Original published format: US 715078 | [1986/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0171227 | Date: | 12.02.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0171227 | Date: | 02.11.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.12.1985 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/135 | [1986/07] | CPC: |
A61K31/135 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/07] | Title | German: | Verwendung von Propiophenon-Verbindung | [1986/07] | English: | Use of propiophenone compound | [1986/07] | French: | Utilisation de propiophénone | [1986/07] | Examination procedure | 29.07.1985 | Examination requested [1986/07] | 28.01.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.05.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.07.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 11.07.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.08.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.09.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.04.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1987 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   08.09.1987 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | |||
Former [1990/26] | BE | 31.07.1989 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4347257 ; | [Y]US4425363 ; | [Y]US4435449 | [Y] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 91, no. 9, 27th August 1979, page 444, no. 72808w, Columbus, Ohio, US; C. VILLANI et al.: "Plasma prolactin (PRL), FSH, LH and testosterone (T) in 71 male patients with sexual disturbances", PROC. SERONO SYMP. 1978, 22, 457-64 |