EP0172670 - An apparatus for effecting and recording monetary transactions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.01.1988 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Technion Research & Development Foundation Senate House Technion City Haifa 32000 / IL | [N/P] |
Former [1986/09] | For all designated states Technion Research & Development Foundation Senate House Technion City Haifa 32000 / IL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Even, Shimon 13 Vitkin St. 34756 Haifa / IL | 02 /
Goldreich, Oded 42 Pinkas St. Tel Aviv / IL | 03 /
Yacobi, Yacov Moshav Atzmon Doar-Na Galil Maaravi (20138) / IL | [1986/09] | Representative(s) | Billington, Lawrence Emlyn, et al Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1986/09] | Billington, Lawrence Emlyn, et al HASELTINE LAKE & CO Hazlitt House 28 Southampton Buildings Chancery Lane London WC2A 1AT / GB | Application number, filing date | 85305293.4 | 25.07.1985 | [1986/09] | Priority number, date | US19840635258 | 27.07.1984 Original published format: US 635258 | [1986/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0172670 | Date: | 26.02.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0172670 | Date: | 21.01.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.12.1986 | Classification | IPC: | G07F7/00 | [1986/09] | CPC: |
G07F7/1008 (EP);
G06K19/07 (EP);
G06Q20/341 (EP);
G06Q20/4093 (EP);
G06Q20/40975 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/09] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Ausführen und Registrieren von Geldüberweisungen | [1986/09] | English: | An apparatus for effecting and recording monetary transactions | [1986/09] | French: | Dispositif pour effectuer et enregistrer des transactions monétaires | [1986/09] | File destroyed: | 16.08.1994 | Examination procedure | 21.07.1987 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1988/11] | 20.10.1987 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1988/11] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 21.07.1987 | M02   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1987 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2066540 (LETHABY & CO LTD); | [Y]WO8102070 (BENTON W); | [Y]GB2102606 (NAT RES DEV [GB]); | [A]WO8303694 (BENTON WILLIAM M) | [X] - ADVANCES IN CRYPTOLOGY, PROCEEDINGS OF CRYPTO '83, 22nd-24th August 1983, pages 383-386, Plenum Press, New YorkUS; S. EVEN et al.: "Electronic wallet" |