EP0183341 - Capped core element terminal [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.07.1989 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TELEFLEX INCORPORATED 155 S. Limerick Road Limerick Pennsylvania 19468 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1986/23] | For all designated states TELEFLEX INCORPORATED 155 S. Limerick Road Limerick Pennsylvania 19468 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Spease, Arthur L 15456 Fairlane Street Livonia Michigan 48154 / US | [1986/23] | Representative(s) | Wharton, Peter Robert, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Tower North Central Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1986/41] | Wharton, Peter Robert, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord Inventions House Valley Court, Canal Road Bradford BD1 4SP / GB | ||
Former [1986/23] | Meeks, Frank Burton Urquhart-Dykes & Lord 47 Marylebone Lane London W1M 6DL / GB | Application number, filing date | 85305936.8 | 21.08.1985 | [1986/23] | Priority number, date | US19840675775 | 28.11.1984 Original published format: US 675775 | [1986/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0183341 | Date: | 04.06.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/23] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0183341 | Date: | 13.08.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.06.1986 | Classification | IPC: | F16C1/14, F16C11/06 | [1986/29] | CPC: |
F16C1/14 (EP,KR,US);
F16B2200/10 (EP,US);
F16C2240/12 (EP,US);
Y10T403/16 (EP,US);
Y10T74/20408 (EP,US);
Y10T74/2045 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1986/23] | F16C1/14 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1986/23] | Title | German: | Endstück mit Druckknopf für Befestigung eines biegsamen Elementes | [1986/23] | English: | Capped core element terminal | [1986/23] | French: | Embout à bouchon pour élément flexible | [1986/23] | File destroyed: | 18.07.1995 | Examination procedure | 29.10.1986 | Examination requested [1986/52] | 05.02.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.06.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.08.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 01.02.1989 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1989/36] | 31.03.1989 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1989/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.1988 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0098132 (TELEFLEX INC [US]); | [A]GB2111589 (NIFCO INC); | [A]FR1049045 (EHRENREICH & CIE A); | [AD]FR2345614 (ITW DE FRANCE [FR]) |