EP0177171 - Pneumatic positioners [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.04.1991 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.04.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.06.1991 [1991/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE BABCOCK & WILCOX COMPANY 1010 Common Street, P.O. Box 60035 New Orleans Louisiana 70160 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1986/15] | For all designated states THE BABCOCK & WILCOX COMPANY 1010 Common Street, P.O. Box 60035 New Orleans, Louisiana 70160 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Weber, Lee A. 6435 Curtiss Court Mentor Ohio 44060 / US | [1986/15] | Representative(s) | Cotter, Ivan John, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1986/15] | Cotter, Ivan John, et al D. YOUNG & CO. 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 85306130.7 | 29.08.1985 | [1986/15] | Priority number, date | US19840655172 | 27.09.1984 Original published format: US 655172 | [1986/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0177171 | Date: | 09.04.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0177171 | Date: | 02.09.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0177171 | Date: | 13.06.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.07.1987 | Classification | IPC: | F15B13/16, G05B11/50 | [1986/15] | CPC: |
G05D3/12 (EP,US);
F15B13/16 (KR);
Y10T137/2365 (EP,US);
Y10T137/2409 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1986/15] | Title | German: | Pneumatische Positioniereinrichtungen | [1986/15] | English: | Pneumatic positioners | [1986/15] | French: | Positionneurs pneumatiques | [1986/15] | Examination procedure | 15.01.1988 | Examination requested [1988/11] | 03.04.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.07.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.09.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 04.12.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 12.12.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.01.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 19.01.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.03.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.07.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.07.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.07.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2989063 (CLARK LYNN R); | [A]US3413997 (TAYLOR JOHN L); | [A]US3538935 (SHELTER KENNETH L); | [A]DE2138350 (WESTINGHOUSE BRAKE & SIGNAL) | Examination | US3047002 |