EP0181063 - Colour enhancement [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.05.1991 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.05.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.07.1991 [1991/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CROSFIELD ELECTRONICS LIMITED De La Rue House 3/5 Burlington Gardens London W1A 1DL / GB | [1986/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Johnson, Anthony John Kereusa 7 High Street Cheddington Leighton Buzzard Bedfordshire, LU7 0RG / GB | 02 /
Franklin, Paul Edward Longmead Kitsbury Terrace Berkhamstead Hertfordshire / GB | [1986/20] | Representative(s) | Skone James, Robert Edmund, et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1986/20] | Skone James, Robert Edmund, et al GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 85306218.0 | 02.09.1985 | [1986/20] | Priority number, date | GB19840022988 | 12.09.1984 Original published format: GB 8422988 | [1986/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0181063 | Date: | 14.05.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0181063 | Date: | 25.07.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.03.1986 | Classification | IPC: | H04N1/46 | [1986/20] | CPC: |
H04N1/6027 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [1986/20] | Title | German: | Farberhöhung | [1986/20] | English: | Colour enhancement | [1986/20] | French: | Augmentation de la couleur | [1986/20] | Examination procedure | 19.08.1986 | Examination requested [1986/43] | 12.04.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.08.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.10.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.01.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.03.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 14.03.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.04.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.09.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.09.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2962544 (EDGAR GRETENER); | [A]DE1257574 (HELL RUDOLF DR ING FA); | [A]US4402007 (YAMADA MITSUHIKO [JP]) |