EP0174796 - Enclosure for sorting radioactive material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.02.1989 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HYDRO NUCLEAR SERVICES, INC. 440 North Elmwood Road Marlton New Jersey 08053 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1986/12] | For all designated states HYDRO NUCLEAR SERVICES, INC. 440 North Elmwood Road Marlton New Jersey 08053 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Johnson, Alfred Newton 4722 Hamilton Drive Voorhees New Jersey 08043 / US | 02 /
Prisco, Anthony James 106 Washington Avenue Beverly New Jersey 08010 / US | [1986/12] | Representative(s) | Van Berlyn, Ronald Gilbert 30 The Green Calne Wiltshire SN11 8DJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1986/12] | van Berlyn, Ronald Gilbert 23, Centre Heights London NW3 6JG / GB | Application number, filing date | 85306278.4 | 04.09.1985 | [1986/12] | Priority number, date | US19840648779 | 10.09.1984 Original published format: US 648779 | [1986/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0174796 | Date: | 19.03.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0174796 | Date: | 30.07.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.06.1986 | Classification | IPC: | B07C5/346 | [1986/12] | CPC: |
G21F9/00 (EP,US);
B07C5/346 (EP,US);
D06F93/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1986/12] | Title | German: | Geschlossener Raum zum Sortieren von radioaktivem Material | [1986/12] | English: | Enclosure for sorting radioactive material | [1986/12] | French: | Enceinte pour trier un matériau radioactif | [1986/12] | File destroyed: | 18.07.1995 | Examination procedure | 30.01.1987 | Examination requested [1987/16] | 17.05.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.09.1988 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1989/14] | 04.11.1988 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1989/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.1988 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP58139090 ; | [A]US3986835 (TAKAGI MASARU); | [A]US4061480 (FRYE BURTON L, et al) | [A] - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 7, no. 256 (P-236) [1401], 15th November 1983; & JP - A - 58 139 090 (TOKYO SHIBAURA DENKI K.K.) 18-08-1983, & JP58139090 A 00000000 |