EP0174211 - Locking system especially for pallets [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.03.1988 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states McCann, Thomas Joseph Simark Engineering Company Griffin Industrial Estate Penncricket Lane Rowley Regis West Midlands / GB | For all designated states McCANN, Patrick Simark Engineering C., Griffin Industrial Estate Penncricket Lane Rowley Regis, Warley West Midlands B56 0SN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1986/11] | For all designated states McCann, Thomas Joseph Simark Engineering Company Griffin Industrial Estate Penncricket Lane Rowley Regis West Midlands / GB | ||
For all designated states McCANN, Patrick Simark Engineering C., Griffin Industrial Estate Penncricket Lane Rowley Regis, Warley, West Midlands B56 0SN / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
McCann, Thomas Joseph 2A Knottsall Lane Warley West Midlands / GB | [1986/11] | Representative(s) | Shaw, Laurence 5th Floor, Metropolitan House, 1 Hagley Road, Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8TG / GB | [1986/11] | Application number, filing date | 85306364.2 | 06.09.1985 | [1986/11] | Priority number, date | GB19840022681 | 07.09.1984 Original published format: GB 8422681 | [1986/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0174211 | Date: | 12.03.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0174211 | Date: | 25.03.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.02.1987 | Classification | IPC: | B60P7/10 | [1986/11] | CPC: |
B60P7/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, NL [1986/11] | Title | German: | Arretierungssystem, insbesondere für Paletten | [1986/11] | English: | Locking system especially for pallets | [1986/11] | French: | Système d'arrêt, notamment pour palettes | [1986/11] | File destroyed: | 16.08.1994 | Examination procedure | 26.09.1987 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1988/20] | 18.12.1987 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1988/20] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 25.09.1987 | M02   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.1987 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4311420 ; | [A]US3314633 ; | [A]US3788238 |