Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU577591B | Global Dossier | 29.09.1988 | B2 | AU4338685 | 12.12.1985 | A | Priority number | Date | AU4338685 | 06.06.1985 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0214349 | Global Dossier | 26.04.1989 | B1 | EP0214349 | 18.03.1987 | A1 | Priority number | Date | AUPG538584 | 06.06.1984 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4640220 | 03.02.1987 | A | Priority number | Date | AUPG538584 | 06.06.1984 | AU4338685 | 06.06.1985 |