EP0214349 - A paint booth assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.02.1990 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.04.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 12.06.2002 [2002/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ELECTROPAINTING SALES PTY LTD. 34 Norman Street Peakhurst New South Wales 2210 / AU | [N/P] |
Former [1987/12] | For all designated states ELECTROPAINTING SALES PTY LTD. 34 Norman Street Peakhurst New South Wales 2210 / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fallas, Spyros Unit 11, 17 Gordon Street Brighton Le Sands, New South Wales 2216 / AU | [1987/12] | Representative(s) | JENSEN & SON 366-368 Old Street London EC1V 9LT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/12] | JENSEN & SON 70 Paul Street London EC2A 4NA / GB | Application number, filing date | 85306383.2 | 09.09.1985 | [1987/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0214349 | Date: | 18.03.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0214349 | Date: | 26.04.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.05.1986 | Classification | IPC: | B05B15/12 | [1987/12] | CPC: |
B05B16/20 (EP);
B05B16/95 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/12] | Title | German: | Lackierkabine | [1987/12] | English: | A paint booth assembly | [1987/12] | French: | Cabine de peinture | [1987/12] | Examination procedure | 14.05.1987 | Examination requested [1987/29] | 03.02.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.05.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.06.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.10.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.01.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 04.01.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.01.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.09.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.09.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 26.04.1989 | BE | 26.04.1989 | FR | 26.04.1989 | NL | 26.04.1989 | LU | 30.09.1989 | [2002/24] |
Former [1999/52] | AT | 26.04.1989 | |
BE | 26.04.1989 | ||
NL | 26.04.1989 | ||
LU | 30.09.1989 | ||
Former [1991/08] | AT | 26.04.1989 | |
BE | 26.04.1989 | ||
NL | 26.04.1989 | ||
Former [1990/11] | AT | 26.04.1989 | |
NL | 26.04.1989 | ||
Former [1990/09] | AT | 26.04.1989 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US1448000 (REEVES ORWELL C) |