EP0175562 - Vinyl caprolactam containing hot melt adhesives [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.03.1993 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.03.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.04.1993 [1993/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JOHNSON & JOHNSON MEDICAL, INC. 2500 Arbrook Boulevard Arlington Texas 76014 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/04] | For all designated states JOHNSON & JOHNSON MEDICAL, INC. 2500 Arbrook Boulevard Arlington, Texas 76014 / US | ||
Former [1991/17] | For all designated states Johnson & Johnson Hospital Services, Inc. One Johnson & Johnson Plaza New Brunswick, New Jersey 08933 / US | ||
Former [1986/13] | For all designated states Johnson & Johnson Products Inc. 501 George Street New Brunswick New Jersey 08903 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sun, Robert L. 6 Young Drive Stanhope N.J. 07874 / US | 02 /
Kenney, James F. 5 Highfield Circle Mendham N.J. 07945 / US | [1986/13] | Representative(s) | Jones, Alan John, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London, WC1A 2RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1986/13] | Jones, Alan John, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London, WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 85306574.6 | 16.09.1985 | [1986/13] | Priority number, date | US19840650953 | 17.09.1984 Original published format: US 650953 | [1986/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0175562 | Date: | 26.03.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0175562 | Date: | 04.05.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0175562 | Date: | 29.04.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.03.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C09J177/02, C08L33/06, C08L39/04, A61L15/16, A61L25/00 | [1992/18] | CPC: |
C09J139/04 (EP,US);
A61L15/58 (EP,US);
A61L26/0014 (EP,US);
C09J133/062 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
A61L15/58, C08L39/04 (US,EP);
A61L15/58, C08L39/04, C08L33/06 (EP,US);
A61L26/0014, C08L33/06 (US,EP)
|
Former IPC [1986/13] | C09J3/14, C08L33/06, C08L39/04, A61L15/06, A61L25/00 | Designated contracting states | FR, GB, IT [1986/13] | Title | German: | N-Vinylcaprolaktam enthaltende heissschmelzbare Klebemittel | [1986/13] | English: | Vinyl caprolactam containing hot melt adhesives | [1986/13] | French: | Adhésifs thermofusibles contenant du N-vinylcaprolactame | [1986/13] | Examination procedure | 19.10.1988 | Examination requested [1988/50] | 04.09.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.01.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.07.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.10.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.08.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.10.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.10.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 28.10.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.01.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.09.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.09.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.09.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.09.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AP]WO8403837 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]); | [A]GB2073209 (KENDALL & CO); | [AD]FR2037671 (BASF AG) |