EP0176306 - Method of manufacturing for vibration damping materials [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1986/14] | Vibration damping materials | ||
[1989/51] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 08.10.1992 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.10.1992 | Opposition rejected | published on 25.11.1992 [1992/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WARDLE STOREYS PLC Grove Mill Earby Colne Lancashire BB8 6UT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1986/14] | For all designated states WARDLE STOREYS PLC Grove Mill Earby Colne Lancashire BB8 6UT / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Grunwell, Walter Laneside Farm Wigglesworth Skipton North Yorkshire / GB | [1986/14] | Representative(s) | Knott, Stephen Gilbert, et al Mathisen & Macara LLP Communications House South Street Staines-upon-Thames Middlesex, TW18 4PR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1986/14] | Knott, Stephen Gilbert, et al MATHISEN, MACARA & CO. The Coach House 6-8 Swakeleys Road Ickenham Uxbridge Middlesex UB10 8BZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 85306591.0 | 17.09.1985 | [1986/14] | Priority number, date | GB19840024048 | 22.09.1984 Original published format: GB 8424048 | GB19850012085 | 13.05.1985 Original published format: GB 8512085 | US19850701505 | 14.02.1985 Original published format: US 701505 | [1986/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0176306 | Date: | 02.04.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0176306 | Date: | 14.01.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0176306 | Date: | 20.12.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.11.1986 | Classification | IPC: | B29B7/90, C08L31/04, C08K5/12, B29C67/24, B29C43/24, // B29K31:00 | [1986/14] | CPC: |
C08J5/00 (EP);
C08K5/12 (EP);
B29C43/24 (EP);
B29K2031/00 (EP);
B29K2309/10 (EP);
B29K2995/0002 (EP);
| C-Set: |
C08K5/12, C08L31/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, IT, NL, SE [1986/14] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Herstellen schwingungsdämpfender Werkstoffe | [1989/51] | English: | Method of manufacturing for vibration damping materials | [1989/51] | French: | Procédé pour la fabrication de matériaux d'amortissage de vibration | [1989/51] |
Former [1986/14] | Schwingungsdämpfende Werkstoffe | ||
Former [1986/14] | Vibration damping materials | ||
Former [1986/14] | Matériaux d'amortissage de vibration | Examination procedure | 07.07.1987 | Examination requested [1987/37] | 08.03.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.09.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.03.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 05.06.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 13.06.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.07.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 25.07.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
18.09.1990
12.11.1990
ADMISSIBLE Hoechst Aktiengesellschaft Werk Kalle-Albert Zentrale Patentabteilung KA D-65174 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/46] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
18.09.1990
12.11.1990
ADMISSIBLE Hoechst Aktiengesellschaft Werk KALLE-ALBERT Zentrale Patentabteilung KA D-65174 Wiesbaden / DE | 23.10.1990 | No. 01: Notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition | 02.11.1990 | No. 01: Reply to notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition | 04.01.1991 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 08.07.1991 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 30.03.1992 | Date of oral proceedings | 01.07.1992 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 01.07.1992 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 12.07.1992 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [1992/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.09.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.09.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.09.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB741001 (ARMSTRONG CORK CO); | [X]GB797630 (NAT STARCH PRODUCTS INC); | [A]GB1310241 (TEROSON GMBH); | [A]DE3045747 (ELASTOLITH BAUMATERIAL GMBH [DE]); | [A]EP0100066 (DU PONT [US]) | by applicant | GB1310241 |