EP0186264 - An improved body support arrangement [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.02.1992 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.1992 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 29.04.1992 [1992/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Griffin, Gordon Douglas 4594 Victoria Circle Provo Utah 84604 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1986/27] | For all designated states Griffin, Gordon Douglas 4594 Victoria Circle Provo Utah 84604 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1986/27] | Representative(s) | Lee, Philip Graham, et al Marks & Clerk 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1986/27] | Lee, Philip Graham, et al MARKS & CLERK 57/60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 85306722.1 | 20.09.1985 | [1986/27] | Priority number, date | GB19840023810 | 20.09.1984 Original published format: GB 8423810 | [1986/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0186264 | Date: | 02.07.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0186264 | Date: | 20.11.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0186264 | Date: | 24.04.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.09.1986 | Classification | IPC: | A47C23/06 | [1986/27] | CPC: |
A47C23/065 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1986/27] | Title | German: | Stützvorrichtung für den menschlichen Körper | [1986/27] | English: | An improved body support arrangement | [1986/27] | French: | Dispositif pour supporter le corps humain | [1986/27] | Examination procedure | 29.05.1987 | Examination requested [1989/30] | 12.12.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.03.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.06.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.10.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.01.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 28.01.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.01.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.09.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.09.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.09.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 20.05.1987 | M02   Fee paid on   29.05.1987 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 24.04.1991 | BE | 24.04.1991 | [1992/18] |
Former [1992/03] | AT | 24.04.1991 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2645956 (SCHUMANN WOLFGANG); | [Y]DE2855241 (METZELER SCHAUM GMBH); | [A]EP0019085 (METZELER SCHAUM GMBH [DE]); | [YD]EP0116237 (GRIFFIN G D) |