EP0182475 - Signal amplifier and telephone line feed circuit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1986/22] | Limiting amplifier for common mode feedback in telephone line feed circuits | ||
[1989/37] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.07.1990 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.08.1990 [1990/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AT&T Corp. 32 Avenue of the Americas New York, NY 10013-2412 / US | [1986/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tuhy JR. Frank Philip 56 Stony Brook Road Montville New Jersey 07045 / US | [1986/22] | Representative(s) | Buckley, Christopher Simon Thirsk, et al Lucent Technologies Inc., 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex IG8 0TU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1986/22] | Buckley, Christopher Simon Thirsk, et al AT&T (UK) Ltd. 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex IG8 0TU / GB | Application number, filing date | 85306759.3 | 24.09.1985 | [1986/22] | Priority number, date | US19840667851 | 02.11.1984 Original published format: US 667851 | [1986/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0182475 | Date: | 28.05.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0182475 | Date: | 13.09.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.03.1986 | Classification | IPC: | H04M19/00 | [1986/22] | CPC: |
H04M19/005 (EP,US);
Y02D30/70 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, NL, SE [1986/22] | Title | German: | Signalverstärker und Fernsprechteilnehmeranschlussschaltung | [1989/37] | English: | Signal amplifier and telephone line feed circuit | [1989/37] | French: | Amplificateur de signal et circuit d'alimentation de lignes téléphoniques | [1989/37] |
Former [1986/22] | Begrenzerverstärker zur Gegenkopplung von Gleichtaktsignalen für eine Fernsprechteilnehmeranschlussschaltung | ||
Former [1986/22] | Limiting amplifier for common mode feedback in telephone line feed circuits | ||
Former [1986/22] | Amplificateur limiteur pour une contre-réaction de mode commun dans un circuit d'alimentation de lignes téléphoniques | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 03.11.1986 | Examination requested [1987/10] | 20.07.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.10.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.01.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 14.03.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 21.03.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.06.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 01.06.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.06.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.09.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.09.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB2132448 (STANDARD TELEPHONES CABLES LTD); | [AD]US4007335 (HETHERINGTON IRVINE KEERS, et al); | [A]EP0046588 (INT STANDARD ELECTRIC CORP [US]); | [A]DE2119440 (RCA CORP); | [A]GB2024564 (TRT TELECOM RADIO ELECTR) | [AD] - IEEE JOURNAL OF SOLID-STATE CIRCUITS, vol. SC-16, no. 4, August 1981, pages 261-265; D.W. AULL et al.: "A high-voltage IC for a transformerless trunk and subscriber line interface" |