EP0176362 - Filter systems [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.06.1989 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION Westinghouse Building Gateway Center Pittsburgh Pennsylvania 15235 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1986/14] | For all designated states WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION Westinghouse Building Gateway Center Pittsburgh Pennsylvania 15235 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ciliberti, David Frank 4130 Verner Drive Murrysville Pennsylvania / US | 02 /
Lippert, Thomas Edwin 3205 Cambridge Road Murrysville Pennsylvania / US | [1986/14] | Representative(s) | Van Berlyn, Ronald Gilbert 30 The Green Calne Wiltshire SN11 8DJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1986/14] | van Berlyn, Ronald Gilbert 23, Centre Heights London NW3 6JG / GB | Application number, filing date | 85306833.6 | 25.09.1985 | [1986/14] | Priority number, date | US19840654697 | 26.09.1984 Original published format: US 654697 | [1986/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0176362 | Date: | 02.04.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0176362 | Date: | 29.04.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.03.1987 | Classification | IPC: | B01D46/02 | [1986/14] | CPC: |
B01D46/06 (EP,US);
B01D46/04 (KR);
B01D46/0005 (EP,US);
B01D46/0043 (EP,US);
B01D46/4281 (EP,US);
B01D46/71 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, FR, GB, IT, LI [1986/14] | Title | German: | Filtersysteme | [1986/14] | English: | Filter systems | [1986/14] | French: | Systèmes de filtres | [1986/14] | File destroyed: | 14.06.1996 | Examination procedure | 27.10.1987 | Examination requested [1988/01] | 11.08.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.12.1988 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1989/31] | 25.01.1989 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1989/31] | 09.06.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.09.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]AT245545B (WAAGNER BIRO AG); | [A]GB1424863 (LYNFIELD H G G); | [A]US3594992 (CARR GEORGE P, et al) |