EP0180328 - Method of mass analyzing a sample over a wide mass range by use of a quadrupole ion trap [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.01.1992 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.01.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.02.1992 [1992/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FINNIGAN CORPORATION 355 River Oaks Parkway San Jose California 95134 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1986/19] | For all designated states FINNIGAN CORPORATION 355 River Oaks Parkway San Jose California 95134 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fies, William J. Jr. 155 Cherokee Way Portola Valley California 94025 / US | 02 /
Kelley, Paul Edwin 2898 Rosario Drive San Jose California 95132 / US | 03 /
Reynolds, Walter E. 360 Swett Road Woodside California 94062 / US | 04 /
Stafford, George C. Jr. 1463 Ilikai Avenue San Jose California 95118 / US | 05 /
Syka, John Edward Philip 1002 Valencia Avenue No. 5 Sunnyvale California 94086 / US | [1986/19] | Representative(s) | Cross, Rupert Edward Blount, et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/21] | Cross, Rupert Edward Blount, et al BOULT, WADE & TENNANT 27 Furnival Street London EC4A 1PQ / GB | ||
Former [1990/18] | Wayte, Dennis Travers BOULT, WADE & TENNANT 27 Furnival Street London, EC4A 1PQ / GB | ||
Former [1988/23] | Horton, Andrew Robert Grant BOWLES HORTON Felden House Dower Mews High Street Berkhamsted Hertfordshire HP4 2BL / GB | ||
Former [1986/19] | Horton, Andrew Robert Grant BOWLES HORTON Felden House Dower Mews High Street Berkhamsted Hertfordshire HP4 2BL / GB | Application number, filing date | 85306945.8 | 27.09.1985 | [1986/19] | Priority number, date | US19840663314 | 22.10.1984 Original published format: US 663314 | [1986/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0180328 | Date: | 07.05.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0180328 | Date: | 30.08.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.02.1986 | Classification | IPC: | H01J49/42 | [1986/19] | CPC: |
H01J49/424 (EP,US);
H01J49/427 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1986/19] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Massenanalyse einer Probe in einem grossen Massenbereich mittels Quadrupol-Ionenfalle | [1986/19] | English: | Method of mass analyzing a sample over a wide mass range by use of a quadrupole ion trap | [1986/19] | French: | Procédé d'analyse en masse d'échantillon dans une région de masse large en utilisant un piège à ions quadripôle | [1986/19] | Examination procedure | 06.10.1986 | Examination requested [1986/49] | 04.03.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.07.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.09.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.02.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.06.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 01.06.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.05.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.09.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.09.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | SU1104602 [ ]; | EP0113207 [ ] (FINNIGAN CORP [US]); | EP0117717 [ ] (VG INSTR GROUP [GB]); | US4214160 [ ] (FIES WILLIAM J [DE], et al) | [ ] - SOVIET INVENTIONS ILLUSTRATED, Section E1, week 85/10, April 17, 1985 DERWENT PUBLICATIONS LTD., London V0 5; & SU-A-1104602 (RYAZAN), & SU1104602 A 00000000 | Examination | - SOVIET INVENTIONS ILLUSTRATED, Section El, week 85/10, April 17, 1985 DERWENT PUBLICATIONS LTD., London VO 5 |