EP0177363 - Internal bead removal tool [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.08.1988 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUSION GROUP PLC Smeckley Wood Close Chesterfield Trading Estate Sheepbridge Chesterfield, Derbyshire S41 9PZ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1986/15] | For all designated states FUSION GROUP PLC Smeckley Wood Close Chesterfield Trading Estate Sheepbridge Chesterfield, Derbyshire S41 9PZ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jarvis, Brian 138 Stonelow Road Dronfield Sheffield S18 6EP / GB | [1986/15] | Representative(s) | Ford, Michael Frederick, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London ECV 8AS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1986/15] | Ford, Michael Frederick, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 85307118.1 | 04.10.1985 | [1986/15] | Priority number, date | GB19840025139 | 04.10.1984 Original published format: GB 8425139 | [1986/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0177363 | Date: | 09.04.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0177363 | Date: | 12.08.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.06.1987 | Classification | IPC: | B29C37/02, B23D79/02, B23D79/02 | [1987/30] | CPC: |
B23D79/023 (EP);
B29C37/02 (EP);
B29C37/04 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1986/15] | B29C37/02, B23D79/02 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, NL [1986/15] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Entfernen von Innengraten | [1986/15] | English: | Internal bead removal tool | [1986/15] | French: | Dispositif pour enlever un bourrelet intérieur | [1986/15] | File destroyed: | 16.08.1994 | Examination procedure | 13.02.1988 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1988/40] | 11.05.1988 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1988/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.10.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 12.02.1988 | M02   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE2313630 [ ]; | US3999292 [ ]; | US4084484 [ ] |