EP0178895 - Fluidized and rehydratable magaldrate compositions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.01.1992 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.01.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.02.1992 [1992/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states American Home Products Corporation Five Giralda Farms Madison, New Jersey 07940-0874 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1986/17] | For all designated states AMERICAN HOME PRODUCTS CORPORATION Five Giralda Farms Madison, New Jersey 07940-0874 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wu, Chien-Chin 3250, Kammerer Drive Wilmington Delaware 19803 / US | 02 /
Reuter, Gerald Louis 23 Crescent Drive Plattsburgh New York 12901 / US | 03 /
Coons, Mark Ernest 10 Ashline Drive Champlain New York 12919 / US | [1986/17] | Representative(s) | Wileman, David Francis, et al C/o John Wyeth and Brother Limited Huntercombe Lane South Taplow Maidenhead Berkshire SL6 OPH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1986/17] | Wileman, David Francis, et al c/o John Wyeth and Brother Limited Huntercombe Lane South Taplow Maidenhead Berkshire SL6 OPH / GB | Application number, filing date | 85307392.2 | 15.10.1985 | [1986/17] | Priority number, date | US19840661648 | 17.10.1984 Original published format: US 661648 | US19850765898 | 14.08.1985 Original published format: US 765898 | [1986/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0178895 | Date: | 23.04.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0178895 | Date: | 20.05.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0178895 | Date: | 06.03.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.03.1987 | Classification | IPC: | A61K33/08, A61K9/14 | [1986/17] | CPC: |
A61K9/0095 (EP);
A61K33/08 (EP,KR);
A61K9/14 (EP,KR);
A61P1/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/17] | Title | German: | Fluidisierte und rehydratisierbare Magaldratmischungen | [1986/17] | English: | Fluidized and rehydratable magaldrate compositions | [1986/17] | French: | Compositions de magaldrate fluidisées et réhydratables | [1986/17] | Examination procedure | 11.11.1987 | Examination requested [1988/02] | 17.04.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.10.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.01.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 30.03.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.06.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.09.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.12.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 07.12.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.12.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.09.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.08.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.08.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.08.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR2364657 (LEWIS HOWE CY [US]); | [Y]DE2749789 (AMERICAN HOME PROD); | [Y]US4117116 (BUEHLER JOHN D, et al) |