EP0178939 - Alignment-measuring device for conveyance guides [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.11.1989 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.11.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.12.1989 [1989/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VAAL REEFS EXPLORATION AND MINING COMPANY LIMITED 44 Main Street Johannesburg Transvaal / ZA | [N/P] |
Former [1986/17] | For all designated states VAAL REEFS EXPLORATION AND MINING COMPANY LIMITED 44 Main Street Johannesburg Transvaal / ZA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
McKechnie, Ronald Montague Knox 9, 8th Avenue Vaal Reefs Transvaal / ZA | [1986/17] | Representative(s) | Smith, Philip Antony REDDIE & GROSE 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | [1986/17] | Application number, filing date | 85307517.4 | 17.10.1985 | [1986/17] | Priority number, date | ZA19840008102 | 17.10.1984 Original published format: ZA 848102 | [1986/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0178939 | Date: | 23.04.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0178939 | Date: | 10.12.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0178939 | Date: | 28.12.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.10.1986 | Classification | IPC: | B66B7/02, E21D7/02 | [1986/17] | CPC: |
B66B19/002 (EP,US);
B66B7/1246 (EP,US);
E21D7/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, SE [1986/17] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Messen des Abgleichs in Führungsförderanlagen | [1986/17] | English: | Alignment-measuring device for conveyance guides | [1986/17] | French: | Dispositif de mesure de l'alignement de guides d'ascenseur | [1986/17] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 04.02.1987 | Examination requested [1987/16] | 22.09.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.01.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.02.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.04.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.05.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 17.05.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.09.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2123792 (LINDEN ALIMAK AB); | [A]DE1001470 ; | [A]DE362905 (LEON CANIVET) |