EP0180388 - Containers for molten metal [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.10.1990 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 31.10.2007 [2007/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FOSECO INTERNATIONAL LIMITED 285 Long Acre Nechells Birmingham B7 5JR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1986/19] | For all designated states FOSECO INTERNATIONAL LIMITED 285 Long Acre Nechells Birmingham B7 5JR / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Barnes, Andrew 6 Castle Hall Glascote Tamworth Staffordshire / GB | 02 /
Flood, James 4 Lomax Close Lichfield Staffordshire / GB | [1986/19] | Representative(s) | Moore, John Hamilton Foseco Holding International Limited Group Patents Department 285 Long Acre Nechells Birmingham B7 5JR / GB | [1989/24] |
Former [1986/19] | Warman, Charles Alfred Group Patents Department Foseco Minsep International Limited 285 Long Acre Nechells Birmingham B7 5JR / GB | Application number, filing date | 85307558.8 | 18.10.1985 | [1986/19] | Priority number, date | GB19840027711 | 01.11.1984 Original published format: GB 8427711 | [1986/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0180388 | Date: | 07.05.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0180388 | Date: | 13.05.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0180388 | Date: | 27.12.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.03.1987 | Classification | IPC: | B22D41/02, F27D1/00 | [1986/19] | CPC: |
F27D1/16 (EP);
B22D41/02 (EP);
F27B14/10 (EP);
F27D1/0006 (EP);
F27B2014/104 (EP);
F27B2014/106 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1986/19] | Title | German: | Behälter für geschmolzenes Metall | [1986/19] | English: | Containers for molten metal | [1986/19] | French: | Récipients pour métal fondu | [1986/19] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 30.03.1987 | Examination requested [1987/22] | 10.09.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.02.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.03.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.07.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.02.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.03.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.04.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.06.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.06.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 30.06.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.09.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.09.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.09.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.09.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 27.12.1989 | FR | 27.12.1989 | IT | 27.12.1989 | NL | 27.12.1989 | SE | 27.12.1989 | [2002/24] |
Former [1999/42] | AT | 27.12.1989 | |
IT | 27.12.1989 | ||
NL | 27.12.1989 | ||
SE | 27.12.1989 | ||
Former [1990/52] | AT | 27.12.1989 | |
NL | 27.12.1989 | ||
SE | 27.12.1989 | ||
Former [1990/43] | NL | 27.12.1989 | |
SE | 27.12.1989 | ||
Former [1990/34] | SE | 27.12.1989 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]GB1477632 (FOSECO INT); | [A]DE2745272 (FOSECO TRADING AG); | [A]DE2824773 (DAUSSAN & CO); | [A]DE3301112 (LABATE MICHAEL D [US]) |