EP0180400 - An inserter system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.10.1991 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.10.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.11.1991 [1991/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pitney Bowes, Inc. Walter H. Wheeler, Jr. Drive Stamford Connecticut 06926 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1986/19] | For all designated states PITNEY BOWES, INC. Walter H. Wheeler, Jr. Drive Stamford Connecticut 06926 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Piotroski, Peter N. 24 Nuthatch Hill Road Trumbull Connecticut 06611 / US | [1986/19] | Representative(s) | Cook, Anthony John, et al D. YOUNG & CO. 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | [1986/19] | Application number, filing date | 85307632.1 | 22.10.1985 | [1986/19] | Priority number, date | US19840665816 | 29.10.1984 Original published format: US 665816 | [1986/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0180400 | Date: | 07.05.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0180400 | Date: | 02.03.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0180400 | Date: | 05.12.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.01.1988 | Classification | IPC: | B07C1/00, B43M3/04 | [1986/19] | CPC: |
B07C1/00 (EP,US);
B41L1/04 (EP,US);
B43M3/04 (EP,US);
B65H43/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [1986/19] | Title | German: | Einlegeverfahren | [1986/19] | English: | An inserter system | [1986/19] | French: | Système d'insertion | [1986/19] | Examination procedure | 09.08.1988 | Examination requested [1988/40] | 19.10.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.04.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.07.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.12.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.01.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.05.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.06.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 20.06.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.09.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.09.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0102699 (PITNEY BOWES INC [US]); | [A]EP0098742 (PITNEY BOWES INC [US]); | [Y]US4332464 (BARTULIS MICHAEL V, et al); | [A]US4479197 (HAAG GEORGE A [US], et al); | [A]US4034973 (HAMS KENNETH A) |