EP0181755 - Method for holding a moving film [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.05.1989 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.07.1989 [1989/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TORAY INDUSTRIES, INC. 2, Nihonbashi-Muromachi 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1986/21] | For all designated states TORAY INDUSTRIES, INC. 2, Nihonbashi-Muromachi 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hagiwara, Satoru 10-A5-18, Sonoyama 2-chome Otsu-shi Shiga-ken / JP | 02 /
Satoh, Kimio 4-13-1, Sonoyama 2-chome Otsu-shi Shiga-ken / JP | 03 /
Okabe, Kazuo 740-12, Aza Wakamiya Oaza Hie Chuzu-cho Yasu-gun Shiga-ken / JP | [1986/21] | Representative(s) | Ellis, John Clifford H., et al MEWBURN ELLIS & CO. 2/3 Cursitor Street London EC4A 1BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1986/21] | Ellis, John Clifford Holgate, et al MEWBURN ELLIS & CO. 2/3 Cursitor Street London EC4A 1BQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 85307993.7 | 04.11.1985 | [1986/21] | Priority number, date | JP19840232467 | 06.11.1984 Original published format: JP 23246784 | [1986/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0181755 | Date: | 21.05.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0181755 | Date: | 10.09.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0181755 | Date: | 03.08.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.07.1986 | Classification | IPC: | B29C55/06, B29C55/14, B29C71/00, B65H23/02 | [1988/31] | CPC: |
B65H20/02 (EP,US);
B29C55/06 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1986/37] | B29C55/06, B29C55/14, B65H23/02, B65H23/02 | ||
Former IPC [1986/21] | B29C71/00, B29C55/14, B65H23/02 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1986/21] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Halten eines bewegten Filmes | [1986/21] | English: | Method for holding a moving film | [1986/21] | French: | Méthode de maintien d'un film en mouvement | [1986/21] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 09.12.1986 | Examination requested [1987/09] | 26.06.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.10.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.11.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.02.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.03.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 24.03.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.05.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.11.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP55027270 ; | [A]GB890005 (DU PONT); | [AD]US3068528 (EDWARD OWENS JOHN); | [A]CH487725 (HOECHST AG [DE]); | [A]DE1936707 (SCHWARZ LOTHAR); | [AD]US3645299 (EICHLER JOSEF ALFRED, et al) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN ; vol. 4, no. 60 (M-10)[542], 6th May 1980; & JP-A-55 027 270 (DAJAFOIL K.K.) 27-02-1980 (Cat. D,A), & JP55027270 A 00000000 |