EP0182541 - Synthesis of molecular sieving metallosilicates using heteropolymetallates [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.11.1992 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.11.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.12.1992 [1992/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE STANDARD OIL COMPANY Midland Building Cleveland, Ohio 44115 / US | [1986/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Desmond, Michael Joseph 2316 Westminster Road Cleveland Ohio 44118 / US | 02 /
Pesa, Frederick Anthony 764 Circlewood Drive Aurora Ohio 44202 / US | [1986/22] | Representative(s) | Smith, Sydney, et al Elkington and Fife Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1986/22] | Smith, Sydney, et al Elkington and Fife Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 85308055.4 | 06.11.1985 | [1986/22] | Priority number, date | US19840672394 | 16.11.1984 Original published format: US 672394 | [1986/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0182541 | Date: | 28.05.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0182541 | Date: | 07.01.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0182541 | Date: | 02.01.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.11.1987 | Classification | IPC: | C01B33/34 | [1992/01] | CPC: |
C01B35/1009 (EP,US);
B01J23/30 (EP,US);
B01J23/88 (EP,US);
B01J29/03 (EP,US);
C01B33/2876 (EP,US);
C01B33/2884 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1986/22] | C01B33/28 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, GB, IT, NL [1986/22] | Title | German: | Synthese von Molekularsieb-Metallsilikaten mittels Heteropolymetallate | [1986/22] | English: | Synthesis of molecular sieving metallosilicates using heteropolymetallates | [1986/22] | French: | Synthèse de métallosilicates de tamis moléculaires en utilisant des hétéropolymétallates | [1986/22] | Examination procedure | 14.06.1988 | Examination requested [1988/34] | 18.04.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.08.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.11.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.05.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination {1} | 26.06.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.09.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 24.09.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.10.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/52] | Request for further processing for: | 31.05.1991 | Request for further processing filed | 31.05.1991 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 31.05.1991 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.10.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.10.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.10.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 101, no. 1, 2nd July 1984, page 544, column 2, abstract no. 6357x, Columbus, Ohio, US; JOENSSON "Metal ion oxidation. IX. Oxidation of aromatic hydrocarbons and arylacetic acids by heteropoly anions containing nickel (IV), manganese (IV) and cobalt (III) ions as central atoms", & ACTA CHEM. SCAND., SER. B. 1983, B37(9), 761-768 |