EP0182542 - Synthesis of molecular sieving high silica mordenite using synthesis directing organic dyes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.11.1992 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.11.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.01.1993 [1993/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE STANDARD OIL COMPANY Midland Building Cleveland, Ohio 44115 / US | [1986/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Desmond, Michael Joseph 2316 Westminster Road Cleveland Ohio 44118 / US | 02 /
Currie, Janie Kammenof 7925 Thornapple Drive Novelty Ohio 44072 / US | 03 /
Pesa, Frederick Anthony 764 Circlewood Drive Aurora Ohio 44202 / US | [1986/22] | Representative(s) | Smith, Sydney, et al Elkington and Fife Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1986/22] | Smith, Sydney, et al Elkington and Fife Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 85308056.2 | 06.11.1985 | [1986/22] | Priority number, date | US19840672403 | 16.11.1984 Original published format: US 672403 | [1986/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0182542 | Date: | 28.05.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0182542 | Date: | 24.02.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0182542 | Date: | 22.01.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.01.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C01B33/34 | [1992/04] | CPC: |
C01B39/06 (EP,US);
B01J29/18 (EP,US);
C01B39/265 (EP,US);
Y10S423/25 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1986/22] | C01B33/28 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, GB, IT, NL [1986/22] | Title | German: | Synthese von hochkieselsäurehaltigem Molekularsieb-Mordenit unter Verwendung von organischen Farbstoffen zur Reaktionslenkung | [1986/22] | English: | Synthesis of molecular sieving high silica mordenite using synthesis directing organic dyes | [1986/22] | French: | Synthèse de mordenite de teneur élevée en silice, pour tamis moléculaires, en utilisant des colorants organiques pour la direction de la synthèse | [1986/22] | Examination procedure | 19.07.1988 | Examination requested [1988/37] | 07.05.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.09.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.09.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.01.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.05.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.08.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 08.08.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.10.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.10.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.10.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.10.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US4018870 (WHITTAM THOMAS VINCENT); | [A]US4388285 (RANKEL LILLIAN A, et al); | [A]US4414189 (KOKOTAILO GEORGE T [US], et al); | [AP]US4539193 (VALYOCSIK ERNEST W [US]) |